THE LISZT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261164
Charity reporting is overdue by 1020 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/04/2013 14/04/2014 14/04/2015 14/04/2016 14/04/2017
Total gross income £23.63k £11.68k £10.30k £6.96k £7.67k
Total expenditure £8.65k £6.58k £6.58k £7.15k £8.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A