THE SWAY WELFARE AID GROUP

Charity number: 261220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £25.45k £28.39k £36.46k £88.89k £27.73k
Total expenditure £21.18k £22.75k £30.54k £48.05k £25.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A