THE SWAY WELFARE AID GROUP

Charity number: 261220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Elizabeth Cornwell Trustee 22 November 2021
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - SWAY Received: On time
Dr SALLY AGNES CULVER SMITH Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
Jane Maryan Self Trustee 22 November 2021 None on record
MR J R STEVENS Trustee 23 October 2006
THE HONEYWOOD TRUST Received: On time
Jonathan Paul Hartley Chair 27 April 2015 None on record
Mrs Pat Fleat Trustee 25 January 2016 None on record