ST PANCRAS WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 261261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £40.63k £29.62k £89.23k £101.85k £123.58k
Total expenditure £50.94k £34.32k £88.04k £101.15k £130.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A