THE FRIENDS OF STANSTED HALL - THE ARTHUR FINDLAY COLLEGE

Charity number: 261287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yvette Vigato Trustee 06 August 2015 None on record
Francesca Scriven Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
RACHEL CASSON Trustee 20 July 2011 None on record
Paris Legore Trustee 25 May 2017 None on record
Joy Clark Trustee 12 December 2014 None on record