Governing document THE BRITISH GRASSLAND SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JULY 1970 AND AMENDED 13 JULY 1977, 8 JULY 1996 , 30 JUNE 1997, 4 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 29 JUNE 2009 as amended on 01 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND UTILISATION OF GRASS AND FORAGE CROPS FOR THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE AND THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND OF RESEARCH INTO GRASS AND FORAGE CROP PRODUCTION AND UTILISATION , AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF ANY RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.