THE ABBEYFIELD CHALFONTS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261970
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)