INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF COMMUNICATIONS

Charity number: 261990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £458.00k £508.40k £583.96k £720.40k £472.67k
Total expenditure £412.00k £478.45k £577.39k £779.27k £565.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £508.24k £583.37k £720.40k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £163 £583 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £478.45k £577.39k £730.63k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £48.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A