Accounts and annual returns QUATERNARY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 262124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 04 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 04 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 September 2021 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 15 September 2021 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 October 2020 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 October 2020 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window