THE BRITISH LIMOUSIN CATTLE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.05m £997.82k £1.03m £1.00m £999.40k
Total expenditure £950.08k £1.03m £1.21m £1.13m £890.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £188.55k £142.80k £142.53k £141.34k £137.40k
Income - Other trading activities £16.31k £9.84k £76.40k £73.85k £71.70k
Income - Charitable activities £775.18k £780.95k £734.94k £709.38k £736.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £69.14k £64.23k £73.46k £75.83k £53.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £919.20k £1.00m £1.17m £1.08m £848.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.88k £23.76k £45.73k £51.13k £42.20k
Expenditure - Governance £91.05k £97.41k £99.80k £109.85k £74.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.99k £11.44k £9.25k £10.60k £8.26k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0