Trustees THE BRITISH LIMOUSIN CATTLE SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 262966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN WATSON | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Gammie | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Redpath | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian McAuley | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Irvine | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHEAL EDDY | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN CLARK | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GUY GREEN | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JORDON | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MYERSCOUGH | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID DYFAN JAMES | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Laurence Forrester | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Glyn Vaughan | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KARL DANIEL SUDDES | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.