Accounts and annual returns EPWORTH CHOIR

Charity number: 263007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 August 2021 15 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 August 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2018 14 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 August 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window