Financial history THE BURY ST EDMUNDS SOCIETY

Charity number: 263230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £103.35k £99.47k £95.84k £68.12k £70.89k
Total expenditure £97.49k £131.56k £89.88k £73.69k £56.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k