GILLINGHAM DAY CLUB

Charity number: 264439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.40k £4.58k £5.21k £3.94k £0
Total expenditure £4.19k £4.30k £4.68k £4.30k £283
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A