Trustees LONG CRENDON VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 264575
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVIES | Chair | 06 December 2012 |
|
|||||
MOLLY JOHNSON | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMY JOHNSON | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA RUSHBY | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ANN WARNER | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALFRED THOMAS BATES | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE JOHNSON | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MAY BATES | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GEORGE RADWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND PAINTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM MCNEILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.