Governing document STOW AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD AUGUST 1971 AS AMENDED 13TH JULY 1972, 10TH OCTOBER 1978 AND 7 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2015
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE PROMOTION OF TOPICS INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, URBAN DESIGN AND PLANNING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS IN ARCHITECTURE AND PLANNING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT OF THE LIFE AND PHYSICAL FEATURES OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
STOW-ON-THE-WOLD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.