THE CHURCH OF GOD UK UNITED

Charity number: 264650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download