THE CHURCH OF GOD UK UNITED

Charity number: 264650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £42.77k £36.47k £34.12k £35.48k £26.42k
Total expenditure £29.55k £25.15k £35.78k £13.61k £18.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A