LOUDWATER BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 264723
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 February 2021 384 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 November 2019 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 February 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required