Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOUTH EAST SOMERSET BRANCH

Charity number: 264783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window