Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOUTH EAST SOMERSET BRANCH

Charity number: 264783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £284.19k £363.31k £384.84k £384.68k £335.19k
Total expenditure £245.13k £288.30k £320.74k £361.92k £370.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £82.02k