THE BRITISH ANTIQUE DEALERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 264856
Charity reporting is overdue by 216 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £35.67k £46.16k £63.16k £42.23k £41.55k
Total expenditure £41.08k £52.43k £62.49k £45.48k £44.02k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A