Financial history THE RONALD TAIT TRUST

Charity number: 264979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £9.45k £10.76k £11.55k £12.06k £10.74k
Total expenditure £9.40k £8.50k £13.70k £12.15k £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A