THE FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION NATIONAL SPORTS CENTRE

Charity number: 265132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.08k £50.92k £102.18k £152.97k £981
Total expenditure £80.17k £58.02k £36.06k £183.07k £225.17k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A