MIKRON THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 265169
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 04 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 15 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 23 November 2016 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 23 November 2016 54 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)