MIKRON THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 265169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £249.41k £309.66k £271.50k £286.18k £220.74k
Total expenditure £251.38k £275.83k £272.83k £274.55k £168.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £47.80k N/A