THE PENNY TRUST

Charity number: 265887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download