COX GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 265963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £674 £2.37k £9.46k £3.10k £855
Total expenditure £862 £2.43k £8.63k £2.85k £891
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A