BENTLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required