Governing document UK REGIONAL COUNCIL BENEVOLENT FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 1973 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 1985 AS AMENDED ON 25 OCT 1992 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR AND DISTRESSED MEMBERS OF THE INDEPENDENT ORDER OF FORESTERS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF A COURT WITHIN THE FOLLOWING HIGH COURTS: HIGH COURT OF LONDON AND SOUTHERN ENGLAND, HIGH COURT OF CENTRAL ENGLAND, HIGH COURT OF WESTERN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.