Dogfen lywodraethu BOURNEMOUTH AND EAST DORSET HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/08/1973 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO GIVE RELIEF TO THE SICK AND INFIRM BY PROVIDING A COMPREHENSIVE BROADCASTING SERVICE TO PATIENTS, PATIENTS FAMILIES AND STAFF IN HOSPITAL, AND TO MAKE THEIR STAY IN HOSPITAL MORE AGREEABLE BY MEANS OF PROGRAMMES OF A BALANCED NATURE, AND TO PROVIDE A LINK TO THE PATIENT'S FAMILIES. THESE PROGRAMMES WILL BE ACCEPTABLE TO, AND FOSTER GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN, PATIENTS AND STAFF, AND WILL BE TRANSMITTED BY ASSOCIATION EQUIPMENT AND CONVEYED TO THE HOSPITAL RADIO RELAY SYSTEMS BY THE MOST COST EFFECTIVE METHOD AVAILABLE AND WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES. BROADCASTING VIA THIRD PARTIES MAY BE CONSIDERED AS LONG AS THERE IS A BENEFIT TO THE PATIENTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 CONSTITUTION
Maes buddion
BOURNEMOUTH AND EAST DORSET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.