THE WOOLMARKET

Charity number: 266477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.81k £3.94k £5.15k £5.15k £2.31k
Total expenditure £3.02k £3.90k £4.15k £4.07k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A