WEST OXFORDSHIRE ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £34.59k £42.26k £51.39k £46.26k £33.64k
Total expenditure £33.24k £39.72k £50.36k £41.37k £21.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £650 £650 £650 £650 £20.87k