MUSIC-AT-HILL

Charity number: 266570
Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £12.24k £12.30k £8.83k £8.94k £11.00k
Total expenditure £16.22k £11.26k £8.65k £10.41k £11.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0