HENLEY-ON-THAMES DAY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 266950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.99k £81.34k £55.21k £58.04k £83.08k
Total expenditure £66.38k £71.97k £68.90k £68.12k £52.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k N/A