THE WALTON-ON-THE-HILL (SURREY) ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 267124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.46k £21.25k £22.99k £18.71k £22.26k
Total expenditure £19.72k £18.66k £20.98k £17.00k £16.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k