14TH SOUTHGATE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267202
Charity reporting is overdue by 320 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £7.25k £4.93k £7.49k £9.17k £12.35k
Total expenditure £6.52k £5.58k £7.17k £9.03k £15.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A