Trustees THE HOUNSLOW ARTS TRUST LTD

Charity number: 267426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Renata Mludzinska Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Helen Little Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Louise Thompson Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Dr Manjit Hunjan Trustee 29 March 2019
None on record
Catherine Heseltine Trustee 29 March 2019
None on record
COUNCILLOR EDWIN GUY LAMBERT Trustee 20 August 2018
HOUNSLOW COMMUNITY FOODBOX
Received: On time
HOUNSLOW'S PROMISE
Received: On time
THE THOMAS LAYTON COLLECTION
Received: On time
Dr William David Evans Trustee 24 August 2015
None on record
AJAY MEHTA Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
Adam Jackson Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
DUNCAN SMITH Trustee
None on record