GOSPEL PRINTING MISSION LIMITED

Charity number: 267903
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 20 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)