GOSPEL PRINTING MISSION LIMITED

Charity number: 267903
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £82.83k £26.38k £175.51k £72.08k £47.27k
Total expenditure £27.46k £22.14k £30.86k £32.09k £42.98k