INAS (ITALIAN WELFARE) LIMITED

Charity number: 267945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 December 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 December 2019 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 January 2017 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 January 2017 64 days late Download