ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 267976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.10k £3.25k £3.41k £3.57k £2.90k
Total expenditure £3.10k £3.25k £3.40k £3.50k £2.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A