Trustees THE CHARTERHOUSE WAR MEMORIAL AND TERCENTENARY TRUST
Charity number: 268012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Mary Dawkins | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Andrew Jesse Motion | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sam Cooke | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Aiers | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
William McMullan | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Mason | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Giles Barling | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Alexander Peterken | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter Goodliffe | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
JEREMY BELL | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.