ISLINGTON LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 268468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marian Ellingworth Chair 01 December 2017 None on record
Russell Austin Smith-Becker Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record
PAUL GEORGE LOWENBERG Trustee 20 March 2018
LASA CHARITY UK LIMITED Received: On time
JEMIMA JOLL Trustee None on record
Michael Collins Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record
Susan Mary Lee Trustee 18 June 2013 None on record
LINDSAY EDKINS Trustee 17 October 2017 None on record
Paula Punjwaria-Alessandro Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
Onika Adams Trustee 18 June 2013 None on record