Financial history THE LAW SOCIETY CHARITY

Charity number: 268736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £43.90k £53.01k £45.86k £62.94k £58.55k
Total expenditure £103.52k £103.35k £122.88k £37.78k £20.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A