ST STEPHENS COTTAGES RUMBURGH TRUST

Charity number: 268999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £42.99k £21.75k £36.22k £36.17k £38.19k
Total expenditure £22.37k £77.75k £33.89k £22.26k £49.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A