PETER SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269065
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 May 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2018 113 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 April 2017 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 April 2017 85 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)