Financial history THE PAT AND CHARLES SONABEND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £9.00k £9.74k £8.60k £9.74k £9.96k
Total expenditure £6.96k £12.63k £10.05k £14.71k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A