LONDON CYRENIANS HOUSING LIMITED

Charity number: 269158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.81m £11.76m £12.00m £12.34m £9.76m
Total expenditure £11.70m £11.69m £11.67m £11.73m £9.20m
Income from government contracts £11.54m £11.50m £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.69m £11.65m £11.89m £12.21m £9.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.17k £1.23k £1.44k £50.66k £84.54k
Income - Other £120.37k £103.52k £115.61k £79.18k £125.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.70m £11.69m £11.67m £11.73m £9.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0