Trustees THE ROYAL TANK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 269230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brigadier Gavin James Thompson Chair 21 May 2015
THE COLONEL COMMANDANTS FUND, ROYAL TANK REGIMENT
Received: On time
ROYAL TANK REGIMENT BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE JAMES DEWHURST TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL TANK REGIMENT PUBLICATIONS TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON WORTH Trustee 19 April 2021
THE COLONEL COMMANDANTS FUND, ROYAL TANK REGIMENT
Received: On time
ROYAL TANK REGIMENT BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE JAMES DEWHURST TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL TANK REGIMENT PUBLICATIONS TRUST
Received: On time
Patrick Carroll Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record
ROBERT MAURICE SWINIARSKI Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
DAVID JOHN LARCOMBE Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
DAVID JOHN TAYLOR Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Brigadier Nicholas James Cowey Trustee 24 May 2019
THE COLONEL COMMANDANTS FUND, ROYAL TANK REGIMENT
Received: On time
ROYAL TANK REGIMENT BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE JAMES DEWHURST TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL TANK REGIMENT PUBLICATIONS TRUST
Received: On time
Jason Michael Williams Trustee 24 May 2019
None on record